Koziar, Lauri Diana (CPSO#: 93776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay ON  K0H 2N0
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Koziar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Koziar ( CPSO# 93776 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay ON  K0H 2N0
Phone Number: (613) 387-3120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURI DIANA KOZIAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZIAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Jan 2012 to 22 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013