Kozij, Natalie Katherine (CPSO#: 95754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Region of Waterloo Public Health
99 Regina St. S.
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 575-4400
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King St. W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: 519-421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie K. Kozij Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kozij ( CPSO# 95754 )

Business Address:
210-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Business Address:
Region of Waterloo Public Health
99 Regina Street South
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Phone Number: (519) 575-4400

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE KATHERINE KOZIJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZIJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015