Kozloff, Nicole Rachel (CPSO#: 91600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH, 7th floor
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 4165358501
Fax: 4162604197
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
(c/o St. Michael's Hospital)
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto, ON M5C 1K6
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE RACHEL KOZLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZLOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015