Kozminski, Mary Therese (CPSO#: 88822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone: 519-966-6777
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11811 Tecumseh Rd East
Windsor ON  N8N4M7
Canada
Phone: 519-735-9844
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Pahuta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY THERESE KOZMINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZMINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010