Krakowski, Joseph Lorne (CPSO#: 90822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Phone: (416) 928-3467
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Krakowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Krakowski ( CPSO# 90822 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Phone Number: (416) 964-7265

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH LORNE KRAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014