Kraus de Camargo, Olaf Andres (CPSO#: 89961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Childrens Health Centre
3Rd Floor
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74275
Fax: (905) 521-7953
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kraus de Camargo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. Kraus de Camargo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kraus de Camargo ( CPSO# 89961 )

Business Address:
Ron Joyce Childrens Health Centre
3rd Floor
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Olaf Andre Kraus de Camargo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics, Division of Developmental Paediatrics at
                        McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.  Kraus  de  Camargo  holds  a
                        geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank
                        of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent  required by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  will automatically expire when Dr. Kraus
                  de Camargo no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.