Krechowicz, Regine Jeanette (CPSO#: 95197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Hospital
Palliative Medicine Fellowship
43 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON  K1N5C8
Phone: (613)562-6262
Fax: (613) 562-6371
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regine Krechowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krechowicz ( CPSO# 95197 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REGINE JEANETTE KRECHOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRECHOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013