Krema, Muhammed Hatem Abdel Aleem (CPSO#: 85106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Floor 18 Room 606
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 5524
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muhammed Hatem Abdel Aleem Krema may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Ophthalmology  and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr. Krema holds  an  academic  appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Krema no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.