Kress, Stephan Gerhard (CPSO#: 77501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Concordia Hospital
1095 Concordia Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R2K 3S8
Phone: (204) 661-7199
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephan Kress Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHAN GERHARD KRESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004