Kriegel Perez, Graciela Ruth (CPSO#: 86154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055 Ext. 6016
Fax: (905) 430-4463
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Frontenac Youth Services
Oshawa ON  L1H 5L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Kriegel Perez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kriegel Perez ( CPSO# 86154 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Business Address:
1160 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 5L8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Argentina
Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACIELA RUTH KRIEGEL PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGEL PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013