Krings, Timo (CPSO#: 89227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Rheinisch-Westfalische Tech Hochschule, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
Room 3MCL 429
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5562
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Krings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Krings ( CPSO# 89227 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
Room 3MCL - 429
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5266

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
5th Floor - Room 562
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
NCSB - 585 University Avenue
Room 1C-546
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
3rd Floor, Room 918
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMO KRINGS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KRINGS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. KRINGS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KRINGS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. KRINGS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. KRINGS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jul 2014