Krishna, Arjun (CPSO#: 90893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjun Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krishna ( CPSO# 90893 )

Business Address:
Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARJUN KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014