Krishna, Lalit (CPSO#: 89782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Krishna ( CPSO# 89782 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LALIT KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008