Krishnamurthy, Ashok Bellur (CPSO#: 87969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Kannada

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
412 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1T3
Phone: (416) 869-3619 Ext. 238
Fax: (416) 869-0510
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 4163237559 Ext. 6
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

145 Queen Street east
Toronto ON  M5A 1S1
Canada
Phone: 4166443081
Fax: 4163648526
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 4165306000 Ext. 3969
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Krishnamurthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krishnamurthy ( CPSO# 87969 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
412 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1T3
Phone Number: (416) 869-3619

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Family Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
145 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 644-3081

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK BELLUR KRISHNAMURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAMURTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008