Krishnamurthy, Ganesh (CPSO#: 81740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2017

Expiry Date:  14 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Radiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6026
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 20 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ganesh Krishnamurthy may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  Division of Paediatric Imaging, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Krishnamurthy  holds  an academic appointment at the rank
                        of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Krishnamurthy no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Krishnamurthy's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a decision about  Dr.  Krishnamurthy's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  March  20,  2017, and currently has an
                  interim  expiry  date  of  March  14,  2019.   The expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations  in  paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.