Krishnan, Koushik Narayan (CPSO#: 94475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328 6143
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koushik Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Krishnan ( CPSO# 94475 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6143

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOUSHIK NARAYAN KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013