Krishnan, Murali (CPSO#: 74248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-1962
Fax: (705) 728-9455
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krishnan ( CPSO# 74370 )
Dr. M. Krishnan ( CPSO# 74248 )

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 205
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-1962

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURALI KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2004 to 18 Jul 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008