Krishnan, Rajesh (CPSO#: 76911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: (905) 373-6933
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajesh Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krishnan ( CPSO# 76911 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008