Kroeker, Joel Scott (CPSO#: 75144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin ON  P0X 1C0
Phone: (807) 547-2818
Fax: (807) 547-3285
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel S. Kroeker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kroeker ( CPSO# 75144 )

Business Address:
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin ON  P0X 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 547-2818

Business Address:
51 Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2066

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL SCOTT KROEKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROEKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002