Kruger, Tamara Lea (CPSO#: 74848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marlee Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M6C 3Z9
Phone: 4167809986
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMARA LEA KRUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003