Kruisselbrink, Richelle Brenda Joy (CPSO#: 88904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richelle Kruisselbrink Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kruisselbrink ( CPSO# 88904 )

Business Address:
McL 2- 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 254-6780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHELLE BRENDA JOY KRUISSELBRINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUISSELBRINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013