Krysl, Joseph (CPSO#: 59459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008