Krywulak, Steven Andrew Todd (CPSO#: 73133)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 1998 to 18 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002