Kubelik, Dalibor (CPSO#: 77484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalibor Kubelik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kubelik ( CPSO# 77484 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIBOR KUBELIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUBELIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 8 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Other - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007