Kucharski, Edward Alfred (CPSO#: 82495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 4696464
Fax: (416) 6997766
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

650 Church St
Toronto ON  M4Y2G5
Canada
Phone: 416 925-2251
Fax: 416 925-3211
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

119 Isabella St
Toronto ON  M4Y 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-962-7600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Kucharski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kucharski ( CPSO# 82495 )

Business Address:
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Business Address:
650 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2G5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Casey House Hospice Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ALFRED KUCHARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007