Kuhnel, Stefanie Peggy (CPSO#: 97458)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2012 to 24 Jun 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jun 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2013