Kujavsky, Andrew Stephen (CPSO#: 74989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Kujavsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kujavsky ( CPSO# 74989 )

Business Address:
356A Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3V6
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN KUJAVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUJAVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002