Kuk, Joda Stanley (CPSO#: 84326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380 Ext. 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 740-4940 Ext. 2340
Fax: (519) 740-7722
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joda Kuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuk ( CPSO# 84326 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODA STANLEY KUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011