Kukreti, Vinay (CPSO#: 92068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Gorakhpur University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kukreti ( CPSO# 92068 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vinay Kukreti may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  at  Queen's University, in which Dr. Kukreti holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Kukreti no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Kukreti's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Kukreti's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 17, 2014, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.   Upon  renewal  of Dr. Kukreti's academic appointment  at  Queen's
                  University, the expiry date  can  be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.