Kukreti, Vishal (CPSO#: 72628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept Medical Oncology & Hematology
Room 5 227
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4566
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VISHAL KUKRETI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKRETI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002