Kulik, Dina Michelle (CPSO#: 86439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 6545437
Fax: 647-689-2371
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kulik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kulik ( CPSO# 86439 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500


Corporation Name: Dr. Dina Kulik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kulik ( CPSO# 86439 )

Business Address:
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA MICHELLE KULIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Dec 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011