Kulkarni, Supriya Ravindra (CPSO#: 75393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue Room 3-963
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5840
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Supriya Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 75393 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
3-963 - 610 University Avenue
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
12th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Mar 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Supriya Ravindra Kulkarni may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.