Kumagi, Teru (CPSO#: 84074)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 03 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ehime Unviersity, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 23 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2009