Kumar, Anil (CPSO#: 76693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University India, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2005 to 14 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2006 to 14 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009