Kumar, David Vijay (CPSO#: 93894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph Regional Health Center
2801 Franciscan Dr.
Bryan TX  77802
United States
Phone: (979) 776-3777
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. David Vijay Kumar may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            only.