Kumar, Devendra (CPSO#: 94460)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rajasthan University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 22 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2012