Kumar, Naresh (CPSO#: 82009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Healthline Medical Centre
Unit 3
150 Yellow Avens Blvd
Brampton ON  L6R 0M5
Phone: (905) 789-9100
Fax: (905) 789-9155
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Healthline Medical centre
Unit C
10510 Torbram Rd
Brampton ON  L6R 3N9
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-5400
Fax: (905) 790-5410
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

83 Mill Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-2402
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kumar ( CPSO# 82009 )

Business Address:
3 - 150 Yellow Avens Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 0M5
Phone Number: (905) 789-9100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jan 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006