Kumar, Rajat (CPSO#: 94309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Maulana Azad Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajat Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar ( CPSO# 94309 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P4

Business Address:
200 Ronson Drive
Suite 102
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Rajat Kumar may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
                  only.