Kumar, Rohit Tinni (CPSO#: 62327)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.T. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 31 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010