Kumar Tyagi, Nidhi (CPSO#: 96147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street G-Wing
Rm 1-131
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guckian Kumar Tyagi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Guckian ( CPSO# 99454 )
Dr. N. Kumar Tyagi ( CPSO# 96147 )

Business Address:
King West Medical Associates
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Cnetre
Room 1-131
G Wing
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIDHI KUMAR TYAGI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KUMAR TYAGI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KUMAR TYAGI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KUMAR TYAGI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KUMAR TYAGI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KUMAR TYAGI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KUMAR TYAGI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019