Kumaranayake, Aravinda Prasanna (CPSO#: 68991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1385 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G2
Phone: (905) 633-7862
Fax: (905) 633-8011
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-2080
Fax: (905) 635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kumaranayake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumaranayake ( CPSO# 68991 )

Business Address:
1385 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G2
Phone Number: (905) 633-7862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARAVINDA PRASANNA KUMARANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARANAYAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999