Kunanithy, Vitharani (CPSO#: 86206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 19 - 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (416) 297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Kunanithy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kunanithy ( CPSO# 86206 )

Business Address:
Unit 19 - 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VITHARANI KUNANITHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNANITHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011