Kuntz, Michael Philip (CPSO#: 23816)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 12 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 12-Sep-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Kuntz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuntz ( CPSO# 23816 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
203 - 974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1752

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 12 Sep 2018