Kupeyan, Kristen Ann (CPSO#: 85660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WRH - Ouellette Campus
Hospitalist Office
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 3319
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1100 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-6722
Fax: (519) 258-9734
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristen Kupeyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kupeyan ( CPSO# 85660 )

Business Address:
Ouellette Health Centre
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125

Business Address:
Hospitalist Office
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1100 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 258-3384

Business Address:
1511 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3X8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN ANN KUPEYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPEYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Oct 2006 to 27 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008