Kuprowski, Mark Christopher (CPSO#: 95708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Allergy and Immunology
268 Grosvenor Street
B3-104
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-685-8167
Fax: (519) 685-8274
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Norman St,
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Kuprowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuprowski ( CPSO# 95708 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Allergy and Immunology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK CHRISTOPHER KUPROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015