Kuriya, Bindee (CPSO#: 79433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Rebecca MacDonald Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street, 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2217
Fax: (416) 284-4997
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Udell and Kuriya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Udell ( CPSO# 80505 )
Dr. B. Kuriya ( CPSO# 79433 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7723

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BINDEE KURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007