Kurki, Sara Dede-Star (CPSO#: 94905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kirkland District Family
Health Team
P O Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Fax: (705) 567-3838
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kurki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurki ( CPSO# 94905 )

Business Address:
Kirkland District Family Health Team
P.O. Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Business Address:
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA DEDE-STAR KURKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 19 Jun 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2011 to 27 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013