Kus, Lukas (CPSO#: 93671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Otolaryngology
2630 Rutherford Road
Unit 200
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: 416-548-4039
Fax: 647-722-5440
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodbine Medical Centre
Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Ave.
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 416-628-4020
Fax: 416-628-4021
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

57 Centre St.
Thornhill ON  L4J 1G2
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-0774
Fax: (905) 881-2393
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zurawska and Dr. Kus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zurawska ( CPSO# 92699 )
Dr. L. Kus ( CPSO# 93671 )

Business Address:
Woodbine Medical Centre
Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-4020

Business Address:
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
200 - 2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKAS KUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015