Kwan, Siu Ling (CPSO#: 31621)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S L Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Partners - Credit Valley Site 220 Eglinton Ave W Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1 T: (905) 813-2200
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018