Kwapis, Jessica Joy (CPSO#: 84297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: Westerholm, Jessica Joy (used until: 25 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Nepali

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Progress Crescent, Suite #9
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone: 705-335-5115
Fax: 705-335-5040
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Kwapis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwapis ( CPSO# 84297 )

Business Address:
Suite 9
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone Number: (705) 335-5115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA JOY KWAPIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAPIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011